Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00435-CV    
02-17-00435-CV
12/05/2017
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of T.A., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/20/2018Brief was not filedAppellee
05/21/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
04/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
08/14/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
07/20/2018Case ready to be set 
07/20/2018Brief was not filed 
07/05/2018Notice of late brief 
06/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/21/2018Amended brief filed 
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/11/2018Corrected brief requested 
04/23/2018Corrected brief requested 
04/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/14/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/05/2018Reporters record due 
02/08/2018Objection to mediation disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/06/2018Clerks record due 
02/06/2018Mediation objection filed 
02/01/2018Deadline for parties to select mediator 
01/30/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
01/26/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/26/2018Fee paid 
01/26/2018Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
01/16/2018Notice of late filing fee 
12/27/2017Fee requested 
12/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
12/12/2017Appellant notified that notice of appeal late/show grounds to continue 
12/05/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C., A. AppelleeMarla Pittman Gilcrease
A., J.AppellantRichard F. Roman
A. Robert Lamb, Jr.
Trial Court Information
367th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Margaret Barnes 
2012-50502-367 
Court Reporter, 367th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site