Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00427-CV    
02-17-00427-CV
11/30/2017
Contract
Judy De La Garza and Thomas M. De La Garza 
The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certificates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates (FHASI 2006-3), and First Tennessee Bank National Association, d/b/a First Horizon Home Loans, and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Remanded to Trial Court
09/25/2018Submitted 
07/12/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/21/2018Case ready to be set 
06/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/24/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2018Notice of late brief 
03/01/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/21/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/08/2018Reporters record due 
01/26/2018Clerks record due 
01/17/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
01/12/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/02/2018Notice of late filing fee 
12/29/2017Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
11/30/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2019StatusMandate to Issue
12/31/2018StatusRelease to publisher
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nationstar Mortgage, LLCAppelleeDaron L. Janis
Thomas G. Yoxall
De La Garza, Thomas M.AppellantMichael Brinkley
First Tennessee Bank National AssociationAppelleeThomas G. Yoxall
Daron L. Janis
De La Garza, Judy AppellantMichael Brinkley
The Bank of New York MellonAppelleeDaron L. Janis
Thomas G. Yoxall
Trial Court Information
367th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Margaret Barnes 
14-04892-367 
Court Reporter, 367th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site