Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00424-CV    
02-17-00424-CV
11/29/2017
Protective Order
Jermaine Watts 
Lisa Adviento 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/22/2018Brief was not filedAppellee
03/08/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/22/2018Case ready to be set 
05/22/2018Brief was not filed 
04/24/2018Notice of late brief 
03/08/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/05/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/14/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/22/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
12/18/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/14/2017Notice of late filing fee 
11/29/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Watts, Jermaine AppellantJermaine Watts
Adviento, LisaAppelleeZena McNulty
Trial Court Information
325th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Judith G. Wells 
325-627998-17 
Court Reporter, 325th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site