Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00419-CV    
02-17-00419-CV
11/27/2017
Expunction
Ex parte E.H. 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
08/23/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/2018Motion filed 
08/16/2018Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/23/2018Case ready to be set 
02/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/09/2018Appearance of counsel 
12/21/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/01/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/30/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/30/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
11/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/01/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
10/15/2018StatusRelease to publisher
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H., E.AppelleeMark W. Bennett
Texas Department of Public SafetyAppellantJeanine C. Hudson
Trial Court Information
431st District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Jonathan M. Bailey 
17-2148-431 
Court Reporter, 431st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site