Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00419-CR    
02-17-00419-CR
12/27/2017
Murder
Brandon Deshawn Humes 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/26/2018Motion to substitute attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/2018Motion to substitute attorney filed 
09/25/2018Submitted 
08/03/2018Objection disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/02/2018Objection filed 
07/25/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/23/2018Case ready to be set 
07/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/09/2018Motion to substitute attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/2018Motion to substitute attorney filed 
02/21/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/09/2018Docketing statement filed 
12/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn E. Meskunas
Joseph W. Spence
Humes, Brandon DeshawnCriminal - AppellantRafee'a S. Majeed
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1483296D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
55 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site