Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00418-CV    
02-17-00418-CV
11/27/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Hong Luo and Zheng Chen 
Robert L. Levy, M.D., and Robert L. Levy, M.D. & Associations, P.A. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/20/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
06/26/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/20/2018Case ready to be set 
06/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/28/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/04/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
12/04/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/04/2017Appearance of counsel 
11/30/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/17/2018StatusReply brief due
09/11/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chen, ZhengAppellantLawrence R. Lassiter
Luo, HongAppellantLawrence R. Lassiter
Levy, M.D., Robert L.AppelleeKimberly Bocell
David M. Walsh, IV
Robert L. Levy, M.D. & Associates, P.A.AppelleeDavid M. Walsh, IV
Kimberly Bocell
Trial Court Information
362nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Robert Bruce McFarling 
14-03331-362 
Court Reporter, 362nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site