Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00414-CR    
02-17-00414-CR
12/21/2017
Theft
Gary Leamon Taylor a/k/a Gary L. Taylor 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/16/2018Case ready to be set 
05/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/10/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/10/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/27/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Taylor, Gary Leamon a/k/a/ Gary L. TaylorCriminal - AppellantAndrew Ottaway
The State of TexasCriminal - AppellantMegan Chalifoux
Robert T. Christian
Trial Court Information
355th District Court 
Hood 
Honorable Ralph H. Walton, 
CR13519 
Court Reporter, 355th District Court 
15 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site