Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00412-CR    
02-17-00412-CR
12/20/2017
Attempted Sexual Assault
Anthony Anderson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/14/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
07/26/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/26/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/28/2018Exhibits filed 
06/27/2018Order entered 
05/08/2018Case ready to be set 
05/08/2018Letter filed 
04/24/2018Response was not filed 
03/14/2018Anders brief filed 
03/14/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
03/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/06/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/06/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/27/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/20/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Anderson, Anthony Criminal - AppellantAnthony Anderson
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
1468433D 
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court  
20 Yrs IDTDCJ, $10,000 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site