Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00410-CV    
02-17-00410-CV
11/16/2017
Probate
Estate of Randall Cross Stegall, Deceased 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/28/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
08/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/13/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
05/10/2018Letter brief filedAppellee
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/2018Letter received 
09/25/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
09/25/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/28/2018Reply brief filed 
08/14/2018Case ready to be set 
08/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/13/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/11/2018Response was not filed 
06/11/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/2018Motion for leave filed 
06/07/2018Motion for leave filed 
05/17/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/10/2018Letter brief filed 
05/10/2018Order entered 
05/10/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/2018Motion filed 
05/01/2018Motion for leave filed 
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/29/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/20/2018Motion to supplement record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/2018Motion to supplement record filed 
03/05/2018Reply to response or motion filed 
02/27/2018Response filed 
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/25/2018Letter received 
02/22/2018Telephone call received 
02/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/22/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/21/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
02/06/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/06/2018Letter received 
01/31/2018Letter filed 
01/25/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/16/2018Letter filed 
12/28/2017Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/2017Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
12/06/2017Appearance of counsel 
12/04/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/22/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/16/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/05/2018MotionMotion to dismiss
10/30/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sparks, DustinAppelleeKatherine K. Elrich
William D. Cobb Jr.
Schultz, MatthewAppelleeDebra S. Crafton
Schultz and Kellar, PLLCAppelleeEric F. Dankesreiter
Geary, Porter & Donovan, PCAppelleeKatherine K. Elrich
William D. Cobb Jr.
Kellar, DustinAppelleeDebra S. Crafton
Stegall, PriscillaAppellantCaleb I. Moore
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Steve M. King 
2013-PR00717-2-1-A 
Court Reporter, Probate Court No. 1 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site