Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00406-CV    
02-17-00406-CV
11/14/2017
Expunction
Ex parte J.L. 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/25/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
04/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/25/2018Reply brief filed 
04/09/2018Case ready to be set 
04/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/02/2018Letter filed 
01/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/09/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/27/2017Appearance of counsel 
11/27/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/21/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
11/20/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L., J.AppelleeHayley M. Brown
Texas Department of Public SafetyAppellantJeanine C. Hudson
Amanda Morrison
Trial Court Information
431st District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Jonathan M. Bailey 
17-2561-431 
Court Reporter, 431st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site