Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00406-CR    
02-17-00406-CR
12/18/2017
Sexual Assault
Jacob Nathaniel Long 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/09/2018Case ready to be set 
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/05/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/16/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/30/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/18/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSteven W. Conder
Joseph W. Spence
Long, Jacob NathanielCriminal - AppellantDaniel Collins
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant 
1472619D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 2 
Cts. 1 & 2 - 15 Years on each ct. 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site