Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00405-CR    
02-17-00405-CR
12/15/2017
Appeal from an Order Denying DNA Testing
David Duran 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/26/2018Supplemental brief filedPro Se
03/06/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/10/2018Motion filed 
05/07/2018Motion filed 
05/07/2018Motion filed 
04/27/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
04/27/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/27/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/27/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/27/2018Case ready to be set 
04/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/26/2018Motion filed 
04/26/2018Motion filed 
04/24/2018Motion filed 
04/24/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/19/2018Motion filed 
04/17/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/17/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/17/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/17/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/12/2018Motion filed 
04/12/2018Motion filed 
04/12/2018Motion filed 
04/12/2018Motion filed 
04/10/2018Motion disposedDismissed
04/10/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/10/2018Motion disposedDismissed
04/05/2018Motion filed 
04/05/2018Motion filed 
04/05/2018Motion filed 
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/27/2018Motion filed 
03/26/2018Supplemental brief filed 
03/26/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/20/2018Motion filed 
03/15/2018Motion filed 
03/06/2018Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/06/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/2018Order entered 
03/06/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/01/2018Motion for oral argument filed 
03/01/2018Motion filed 
02/23/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/23/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/15/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/12/2018Motion filed 
02/12/2018Letter received 
02/12/2018Motion filed 
01/22/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/2018Motion filed 
01/11/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/10/2018No reporters record filed in criminal case 
01/10/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/10/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/10/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/05/2018Letter received 
01/05/2018Motion filed 
01/05/2018Motion filed 
01/05/2018Motion filed 
01/05/2018Motion filed 
01/05/2018Letter received 
01/02/2018Motion filed 
01/02/2018Motion filed 
01/02/2018Motion filed 
12/29/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/29/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/29/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/27/2017Motion filed 
12/27/2017Motion filed 
12/27/2017Motion filed 
12/20/2017Trial court certification filed 
12/15/2017Notice to trial court that certification is missing 
12/15/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/2018MotionMotion pending
03/27/2018MotionMotion pending
04/26/2018MotionMotion pending
05/07/2018MotionMotion pending
05/07/2018MotionMotion pending
05/10/2018MotionMotion pending
05/30/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Duran, David Criminal - AppellantDavid Duran
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMatthew J. Whitten
Catherine Luft
Trial Court Information
211th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Brody Young Shanklin 
F-2003-0427-C 
Court Reporter, 211th District Court, Denton County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site