Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00404-CV    
02-17-00404-CV
11/14/2017
Personal Injury
Norman Delamar 
Fort Worth Mountain Biker's Association 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
02/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/11/2018Submitted 
08/29/2018Letter received 
08/08/2018Letter filed 
06/25/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/10/2018Case ready to be set 
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/19/2018Letter received 
02/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/14/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/14/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/14/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/14/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Delamar, NormanAppellantThomas M. Michel
Fort Worth Mountain Biker's AssociationAppelleeAmos Dwayne Pettis
J. Eric Elder
Trial Court Information
348th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Michael Wallach 
348-283758-16 
Court Reporter, 348th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site