Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00403-CV    
02-17-00403-CV
11/14/2017
Divorce
Justin Anthony Sternberg 
Andrea Ryan Dorchester 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/13/2018Brief was not filedAppellee
06/04/2018Appendix filedAppellant
05/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/13/2018Case ready to be set 
08/13/2018Brief was not filed 
08/08/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
08/06/2018Letter received 
07/18/2018Notice of late brief 
06/04/2018Appendix filed 
05/23/2018Corrected brief requested 
05/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/11/2018Notice of late brief 
04/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/08/2018Notice of late brief 
01/25/2018Notice filed 
01/24/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/08/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sternberg, Justin AnthonyAppellantRhonda R. Bartlett
Dorchester, Andrea RyanAppelleeAndrea Ryan Dorchester
Trial Court Information
322nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Nancy L. Berger 
322-582401-15 
Court Reporter, 322nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site