Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00401-CR    
02-17-00401-CR
12/11/2017
Driving While Intoxicated
Dwight Leslie Clifford 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
06/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2018Submitted 
07/24/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/19/2018Case ready to be set 
07/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/09/2018Certification of word count compliance filed 
06/22/2018Corrected brief requested 
06/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/12/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/11/2018Order entered 
05/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/21/2018Notice of late brief 
02/07/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/17/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/17/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/11/2018Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
01/09/2018Docketing statement filed 
12/15/2017Letter filed 
12/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Brendan Hyde
Clifford, Dwight LeslieCriminal - AppellantSandra Reynolds
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 2 
Denton 
Honorable Virgil Vahlenkamp 
CR-2016-10477-B 
Court Reporter, Denton County Criminal Court No. 2 
22 Months Probation $750 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site