Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00400-CV    
02-17-00400-CV
11/13/2017
Tax
Denton Central Appraisal District 
Richard Scott Gladden 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/17/2018Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/10/2018Reply brief filedAppellee
05/07/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
04/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
02/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/23/2018Notice filed 
07/20/2018Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
07/20/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
07/20/2018Letter issued by the court 
07/05/2018Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/17/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
05/17/2018Amicus curiae brief received 
05/11/2018Letter received 
05/11/2018Letter received 
05/10/2018Reply brief filed 
05/07/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
04/30/2018Letter received 
04/25/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/18/2018Case ready to be set 
04/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/15/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/15/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/15/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018MotionMotion for en banc reconsideration
07/23/2018MotionMotion for rehearing
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Denton Central Appraisal DistrictAppellantChristopher S. Jackson
A. Dylan Wood
Gladden, Richard ScottAppelleeRichard S. Gladden
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Douglas M. Robison 
2013-61154-393 
Court Reporter, 393rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site