Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00391-CR    
02-17-00391-CR
11/30/2017
Engaging in Organized Criminal Activity
Ameer Hirani 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/02/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
03/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/25/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
04/19/2018Case ready to be set 
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/02/2018Amended brief filed 
03/26/2018Corrected brief requested 
03/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/22/2018Notice of late record 
01/17/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/20/2017Letter received 
12/18/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/18/2017Letter received 
11/30/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasLandon Wade
Joseph W. Spence
Hirani, AmeerCriminal - AppellantJames Lee Bright
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1472571D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
3 Yrs. Probation $300 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site