Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00389-CR    
02-17-00389-CR
11/30/2017
Sexual Assault
Justin Clinton Burkett 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/09/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/31/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/01/2018Case ready to be set 
05/01/2018Response was not filed 
04/12/2018Response was not filed 
03/09/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
03/09/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
03/09/2018Anders brief filed 
03/07/2018Document filed 
02/27/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/13/2018Reporters record filed 
12/06/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/30/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/12/2018MotionMotion to withdraw as attorney
06/22/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDee Peavy
Burkett, Justin ClintonCriminal - AppellantTim B. Copeland
Justin Clinton Burkett
Trial Court Information
90th District Court 
Young 
Honorable Stephen E. Bristow 
10761 
Court Reporter, 90th District Court 
Ct. 1 25 Yrs. $750 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site