Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00387-CV    
02-17-00387-CV
11/03/2017
Contract
Louis Dorfman, K I Holdings, Ltd., Sam Myers, J.M.D. Resources, Inc., Billy Cogdell Bowden, Barbara Standfield, Stacey Dorfman-Kivowitz, Julia Dorfman, Mark Dorfman, David Philip Cook, Cheryl King Cook, Sam Y. Dorfman, Jr., et al. 
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in its individual capacity and as Trustee of the Red Crest Trust; Orca/ICI Development; Orca Petroleum, Ltd.; and Orca Assets, G.P., L.L.C. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/18/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
07/18/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
05/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/2018Submitted 
07/18/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
07/18/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/28/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
05/30/2018Case ready to be set 
05/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/09/2018Appearance of counsel 
04/24/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/18/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/17/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/17/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/03/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cook, Cheryl KingAppellantMichael J. Lang
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.AppelleeKevin M. Beiter
Jessica B. Pulliam
D. Jed Williams  
Bowden, Billy CogdellAppellantMichael J. Lang
Orca Petroleum, Ltd.AppelleeErnest W. Boyd Jr.
Justin M. Waggoner
Kortz, JerryAppellantMichael J. Lang
Dorfman, MarkAppellantMichael J. Lang
Dorfman, JuliaAppellantMichael J. Lang
J.M.D. Resources, Inc.AppellantMichael J. Lang
Dorfman, Jr., Sam Y.AppellantMichael J. Lang
Cook, David PhillipAppellantMichael J. Lang
Standfield, BarbaraAppellantMichael J. Lang
Dorfman-Kivowitz, Stacey AppellantMichael J. Lang
K.I. Holdings, Ltd.AppellantMichael J. Lang
Orca/ICI DevelopmentAppelleeErnest W. Boyd Jr.
Justin M. Waggoner
Moravits, ShelbyAppellantJon C. Amberson  
Michael J. Lang
Dorfman, LouisAppellantMichael J. Lang
Orca Assets, G.P.AppelleeJustin M. Waggoner
Ernest W. Boyd Jr.
Moravits, FrankAppellantJon C. Amberson  
Michael J. Lang
Mettham, PhillipAppellee 
Myers, Sam AppellantMichael J. Lang
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable J. Wade Birdwell 
342-259139-12 
Court Reporter, 342nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site