Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00387-CR    
02-17-00387-CR
11/29/2017
Injury to a Child, Elderly or Disabled Individual
Rafid Ahmed Gheni Obaida 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
07/26/2018Case ready to be set 
07/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/15/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/08/2018Docketing statement filed 
12/05/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/29/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Obaida, Rafid Ahmed GheniCriminal - AppellantWes Ball
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1388085D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
2 Yrs. IDTDCJ Fine $194.90 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site