Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00386-CV    
02-17-00386-CV
11/02/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Henry Peyton Inge III 
Bank of America, N.A., BOFA Merrill Lynch Asset Holdings, Inc., and BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/17/2018Supplemental brief filedAppellant
06/25/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
06/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/11/2018Submitted 
07/17/2018Supplemental brief filed 
07/17/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/2018Motion for leave filed 
06/25/2018Reply brief filed 
06/21/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/06/2018Case ready to be set 
06/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/02/2018No settlement reached during mediation 
01/19/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/04/2017Mediation order entered 
11/21/2017Response filed 
11/20/2017Appearance of counsel 
11/16/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
11/15/2017Deadline for parties to select mediator 
11/10/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/10/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/02/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BOFA Merrill Lynch Asset Holdings, Inc.AppelleeDavid Romness
Britton L. Larison
Bank of America, N.A.AppelleeJonathan J. Cunningham
Britton L. Larison
David Romness
Inge, III, Henry PeytonAppellantH. Peyton Inge IV
BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P.AppelleeDavid Romness
Britton L. Larison
Trial Court Information
362nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Robert Bruce McFarling 
2012-50780-367 
Court Reporter, 362nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site