Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00385-CV    
02-17-00385-CV
11/02/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Charles Glen Hyde, Northwest Regional Airport, Inc., Texas Air Classics, Inc., Dreamships, Inc., and Hyde-Way, Inc. 
Northwest Regional Airport Property Owners Association, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/07/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/08/2018Motion to postpone oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
05/03/2018Response filed 
05/03/2018Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
05/01/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
05/01/2018Corrected entry made by clerks office 
04/17/2018Case ready to be set 
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/14/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/05/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/01/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/15/2017Letter received 
11/14/2017Notice of late filing fee 
11/02/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/02/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hyde, Charles FlenAppellantAndrea K. Bouressa
Hyde-Way, Inc.AppellantAndrea K. Bouressa
Northwest Regional Airport Property Owners Association, Inc.AppelleeJ. Jeffrey Springer
Texas Air Classics, Inc.AppellantAndrea K. Bouressa
Dreamships, Inc.AppellantAndrea K. Bouressa
Northwest Regional Airport, Inc.AppellantAndrea K. Bouressa
Trial Court Information
16th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Sherry Shipman 
16-05997-16 
Court Reporter, 16th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site