Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00385-CR    
02-17-00385-CR
11/29/2017
Assault
Andrew Ayala 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
06/29/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
06/07/2018Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
06/05/2018Submitted 
05/15/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/07/2018Case ready to be set 
03/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/06/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/12/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/05/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/29/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/03/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAndrea Jacobs
Joseph W. Spence
Ayala, AndrewCriminal - AppellantShelly Messerli
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1499719D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
2 Yrs. IDTDCJ $1000 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site