Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00384-CV    
02-17-00384-CV
11/02/2017
Plea to jurisdiction
City of El Paso 
Max Grossman 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
11/02/2017 
08-17-00200-CV 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/20/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
11/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/11/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/2018Submitted 
12/20/2017Appearance of counsel 
12/20/2017Reply brief filed 
12/08/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
11/21/2017Case ready to be set 
11/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
11/02/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/31/2017Fee paid 
10/25/2017Motion to recuse disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/25/2017Order entered 
10/24/2017Appearance of counsel 
10/24/2017Fee paid 
10/24/2017Motion to recuse filed 
10/23/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/11/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/21/2017Reporters record filed 
09/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/19/2017Letter filed 
09/14/2017Clerks record filed 
09/14/2017Fee paid 
09/12/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
09/12/2017Court fee due 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/24/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grossman, MaxAppelleeJ. Eduardo Cadena
Harriet O'Neill
Karlene Poll
Lisa Hobbs
Frank S. Ainsa
City of El PasoAppellantShelly W. Rivas
Maria Guadalupe Martinez
Mark N. Osborn
Sergio Manuel Estrada
Robert Dubose
Wallace B. Jefferson
Trial Court Information
384th District Court 
El Paso 
Honorable Patrick Garcia 
2017-DCV2528 
Genesis Stephens 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site