Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00381-CR    
02-17-00381-CR
11/21/2017
Driving While Intoxicated
Hector Jimenez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/29/2018Amended brief filedState
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
07/27/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
07/26/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/29/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/2018Amended brief filed 
05/24/2018Motion for leave filed 
05/21/2018Case ready to be set 
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/14/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/05/2018Letter received 
01/18/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/17/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/2018StatusPetition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Jimenez, HectorCriminal - AppellantCarlton Hughes
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1 
Denton 
Honorable Jim E. Crouch 
CR-2016-05099-A 
Court Reporter, Denton County Criminal Court No. 1 
365 Days in County Jail 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site