Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00379-CV    
02-17-00379-CV
10/31/2017
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of H.S., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/27/2018Appendix filedAppellant
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/16/2018Case ready to be set 
05/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/27/2018Appendix filed 
04/17/2018Corrected brief requested 
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/13/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/22/2018Reporters record due 
01/11/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/11/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/09/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
11/09/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/31/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S., S.AppelleeWayne Northcutt
E., T.AppellantTimothy L. Vinson
Trial Court Information
158th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Steve Burgess 
2012-20413-158 
Court Reporter, 158th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site