Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00378-CR    
02-17-00378-CR
11/21/2017
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Joshua David McIntosh 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/09/2018Case ready to be set 
05/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/01/2018Letter received 
04/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/16/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/28/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Landon Wade
McIntosh, Joshua DavidCriminal - AppellantColin McLaughlin
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable George William Gallagher 
1479308D 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
20 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site