Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00374-CV    
02-17-00374-CV
10/27/2017
Contract
Joseph Lambert and Susan Lambert 
State Farm Lloyds and Tevin Senne 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/10/2018Letter brief filedAppellant
07/03/2018Letter brief filedAppellee
07/03/2018Letter brief filedAppellee
06/18/2018Letter brief filedAppellant
06/18/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
06/14/2018Letter brief filedAppellee
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/10/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/10/2018Letter brief filed 
07/06/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
07/03/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/03/2018Letter brief filed 
07/03/2018Letter brief filed 
07/02/2018Motion for leave filed 
06/28/2018Motion for leave filed 
06/20/2018Corrected brief requested 
06/20/2018Corrected brief requested 
06/18/2018Letter brief filed 
06/18/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/14/2018Letter brief filed 
05/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
05/08/2018Case ready to be set 
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/19/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/05/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/29/2017Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
11/21/2017Objection to mediation disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/2017Mediation objection filed 
11/08/2017Appearance of counsel 
11/06/2017Deadline for parties to select mediator 
10/31/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/31/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
10/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Farm LloydsAppelleeDavid Jefferson Fisher
Melissa A. Lorber
Lambert, SusanAppellantAndrew B. Bender
Lambert, JosephAppellantAndrew B. Bender
Senne, TevinAppelleeDavid Jefferson Fisher
Melissa A. Lorber
Trial Court Information
415th District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Roy Graham Quisenberry 
CV16-0048 
Court Reporter, 415th District Court, Parker County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site