Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00374-CR    
02-17-00374-CR
11/20/2017
Assault
Chad Haynes 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/31/2018Case ready to be set 
05/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/06/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/06/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/01/2018Letter filed 
01/30/2018Order received from trial court 
01/30/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/29/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/29/2018Case reinstated 
01/17/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
01/09/2018Order issuedAbated
01/08/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/05/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
01/02/2018Letter received 
12/27/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
12/22/2017Letter received 
12/22/2017Letter received 
11/20/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Haynes, Chad Criminal - AppellantGrace M. Wren
Chad Haynes
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Trial Court Information
431st District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Jonathan M. Bailey 
F16-2748-431 
Court Reporter, 431st District Court 
3 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site