Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00372-CR    
02-17-00372-CR
11/16/2017
Burglary of a Habitation
Gregory Isaacs John 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/19/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/26/2018Submitted 
05/31/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
05/15/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
05/15/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
05/08/2018Case ready to be set 
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2018Motion to substitute attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/2018Motion to substitute attorney filed 
12/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/08/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/27/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/16/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/12/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Jacob Mitchell
John, Gregory IsaacsCriminal - AppellantLisa Mullen
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable George William Gallagher 
1294827D 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
10 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site