Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00368-CV    
02-17-00368-CV
10/23/2017
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of D.D., A Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
12/12/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
12/12/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/05/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
01/30/2018Submitted 
01/09/2018Set for submission on briefs 
01/09/2018Case ready to be set 
01/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/12/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/12/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/28/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/27/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/14/2017Notice of late docketing statement 
11/02/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
11/02/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/02/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/23/2017Case began in court of appeals 
10/23/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/04/2018StatusRelease to publisher
06/14/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeNatalie Barnett
D., D.Civil - Ad LitemSoraya E. Joslin
D., D.AppellantDiondra Lindquist
I., D.AppellantClifford D. MacKenzie
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1 
Parker 
Honorable Jerry Buckner 
CIV-16-0707 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 1, Parker County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site