Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00367-CR    
02-17-00367-CR
11/13/2017
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Lavoy Woods 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
06/27/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
06/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/23/2018Case ready to be set 
07/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/27/2018Amended brief filed 
06/21/2018Corrected brief requested 
06/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/08/2018Order entered 
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/21/2018Notice of late brief 
02/28/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/24/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/27/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/22/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
12/18/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
11/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasLandon Wade
Joseph W. Spence
Woods, LavoyCriminal - AppellantJohn W. Stickels
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant 
1462051D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 2 
45 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site