Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00364-CV    
02-17-00364-CV
10/23/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
In re: the Commitment of Jeffery Lee Stoddard 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc filed 
09/27/2018Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/27/2018Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/27/2018Case ready to be set 
02/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/29/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/13/2017Appearance of counsel 
12/05/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/29/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/27/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/03/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/23/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due
11/26/2018StatusRelease to publisher
12/06/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stoddard, Jeffery LeeAppellantTeresa Dunsmore
Kenneth Nash
The State of TexasAppelleeMelinda Fletcher
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
371st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Mollee Westfall 
D371-S-13391-16 
Court Reporter, 371st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site