Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00359-CV    
02-17-00359-CV
10/20/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Edgefield Holdings, LLC as assignee of Regions Bank 
Kenneth J. Gilbert, Helen K. Gilbert, Chandler Estates, Ltd., and Parker County Real Estate Investments, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/15/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
02/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/10/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
09/20/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/15/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
03/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
02/28/2018Letter requesting attorney to comply on payment and/or designation of record 
02/23/2018Letter received 
02/20/2018Case ready to be set 
02/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/05/2018Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/02/2018Letter received 
02/02/2018Appearance of counsel 
02/01/2018Response filed 
01/29/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
01/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/10/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/10/2018Letter received 
12/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/04/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
11/20/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/13/2017Appearance of counsel 
11/02/2017Order received from trial court 
10/30/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/26/2017Letter received 
10/24/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/20/2017Letter received 
10/20/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/2018MotionMotion to dismiss
11/19/2018StatusRelease to publisher
11/29/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chandler Estates, Ltd.AppelleeEd Huddleston
J. Robert Forshey
Edgefield Holdings, LLCAppellantDarrell W. Cook
Parker County Real Estate Investments, Inc.AppelleeJ. Robert Forshey
Ed Huddleston
C. Edward Fowler Jr.
Gilbert, Helen K.AppelleeJ. Robert Forshey
Ed Huddleston
Gilbert, Kenneth J.AppelleeJ. Robert Forshey
Ed Huddleston
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Craig Towson 
CV16-0784 
Court Reporter, 43rd District Court, Parker County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site