Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00352-CV    
02-17-00352-CV
10/17/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
North American Tubular Services, LLC 
BOPCO, L.P. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/2018Letter received 
05/15/2018Letter received 
05/01/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
05/01/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/25/2018Case ready to be set 
04/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/02/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/27/2017Letter received 
11/27/2017Clerks record due 
11/20/2017Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
11/02/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/01/2017Notice of late filing fee 
10/27/2017Appearance of counsel 
10/20/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
North American Tubular Services, LLCAppellantRebecca E. Bell-Stanton
BOPCO, L.P.AppelleePreston Mundt
John H. Cayce, Jr.
Trial Court Information
96th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable R. H. Wallace 
096-290800-17 
Court Reporter, 96th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site