Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00352-CR    
02-17-00352-CR
11/01/2017
Aggravated Assault
Odell Hall 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/03/2018Case ready to be set 
04/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/22/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/28/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/31/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/03/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
12/28/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/13/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Hall, OdellCriminal - AppellantAaron C. "Clay" Graham
Trial Court Information
213th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Louis E. Sturns 
1361935D 
Court Reporter, 213th District Court 
35 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site