Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00346-CV    
02-17-00346-CV
10/06/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
City of Forest Hill, Texas, and Brigette Mathis 
Michielle Benson, in her official capacity and individually 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
12/06/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/2018Submitted 
01/22/2018Response filed 
01/22/2018Letter received 
01/11/2018Letter received 
01/10/2018Reply brief due 
01/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
12/22/2017Case ready to be set 
12/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/11/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/06/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/06/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/03/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/12/2017Letter received 
10/12/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/06/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/30/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Benson, MichielleAppelleeHarold D. Hammett
Mathis, BrigetteAppellantRobert F. Maris
City of Forest Hill, TexasAppellantRobert F. Maris
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Susan H. McCoy 
153-290222-17 
Court Reporter, 153rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site