Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00344-CR    
02-17-00344-CR
10/23/2017
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Benjamin Tyron Jenkins 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/08/2018Case ready to be set 
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/08/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/21/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/31/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/23/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jenkins, Benjamin TyronCriminal - AppellantTommy C. Wise
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasEdward D. Lewallen
Don Schnebly
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Craig Towson 
CR16-0738 
Court Reporter, 43rd District Court, Parker County 
24 Months State Jail 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site