Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00342-CR    
02-17-00342-CR
10/23/2017
Aggravated Robbery
Matthew Paul Bender 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/18/2018Motion filed 
06/12/2018Case ready to be set 
06/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/23/2018Document Received 
05/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/04/2018Notice of late brief 
02/15/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/06/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/06/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/05/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/26/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/23/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2018MotionMotion pending
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bender, Matthew PaulCriminal - AppellantBlake R. Burns
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn E. Meskunas
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
371st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Mollee Westfall 
1445409D 
Court Reporter, 371st District Court 
10 Yrs Probation, $10,000 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site