Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00341-CR    
02-17-00341-CR
10/23/2017
Aggravated Assault
Michael Lopez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/05/2018Mandate issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
07/19/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
07/05/2018Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
05/23/2018Submitted 
05/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/19/2018Case ready to be set 
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/11/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/16/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/23/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/05/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Lopez, MichaelCriminal - AppellantWilliam R. Biggs  
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3 
Tarrant 
Honorable Robb Catalano 
1490785D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 3 
Cts. 1 & 2 - 10 Yrs IDTDCJ on each ct. 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site