Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00340-CV    
02-17-00340-CV
10/06/2017
Expunction
Ex parte M.W. 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/07/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
05/07/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
04/27/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/26/2018Case ready to be set 
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/16/2017Appearance of counsel 
10/24/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
10/23/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/23/2017Letter received 
10/23/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/19/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/06/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
W., M. AppellantLeigh W. Davis
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
D432-E-12264-16 
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court  
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site