Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00339-CV    
02-17-00339-CV
10/03/2017
Expunction
Ex parte M.W. 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/30/2018Submitted 
05/07/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
05/07/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
04/27/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/26/2018Case ready to be set 
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/06/2018Letter received 
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/16/2017Appearance of counsel 
10/23/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/23/2017Letter received 
10/23/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/18/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/13/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
10/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/29/2018StatusRelease to publisher
11/08/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
W., M. AppellantLeigh W. Davis
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable George William Gallagher 
D396-E-12263-16 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site