Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00338-CR    
02-17-00338-CR
10/20/2017
Burglary of a Building
David Joe Rowland 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/24/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/11/2018Submitted 
06/21/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
05/24/2018Case ready to be set 
05/24/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/23/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/27/2018Letter received 
03/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/24/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/19/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/19/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/20/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/30/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/20/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAndrea Jacobs
Joseph W. Spence
Rowland, David JoeCriminal - AppellantDavid Joe Rowland
Brian J. Newman
Trial Court Information
213th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Louis E. Sturns 
1443877D 
Court Reporter, 213th District Court 
8 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site