Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00332-CR    
02-17-00332-CR
10/17/2017
Aggravated Assault
Lee Charles Jones 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Case returned from higher court 
08/22/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
07/02/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
06/21/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
06/14/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/2018Submitted 
05/15/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/19/2018Case ready to be set 
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/21/2018Notice of late brief 
02/21/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/2018Motion filed 
02/08/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/08/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/30/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/23/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHelena F. Faulkner
Joseph W. Spence
Jones, Lee CharlesCriminal - AppellantElizabeth Cortright
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David Scott Wisch 
1505016R 
Court Reporter, 372nd District Court 
25 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site