Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00330-CR    
02-17-00330-CR
10/17/2017
Aggravated Robbery
Britt Lee Miller 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Case returned from higher court 
08/22/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
07/02/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
06/25/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
06/21/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
06/07/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/2018Submitted 
05/17/2018Original exhibits filed 
05/16/2018Order entered 
05/15/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/04/2018Case ready to be set 
04/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/06/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/13/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/23/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/19/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Miller, Britt LeeCriminal - AppellantKimberley S. Campbell
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasShelby White
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1456595D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
Cts. 1,2,3 30 Yrs. each count IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site