Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00321-CV    
02-17-00321-CV
09/18/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Henry Thiessen 
Fidelity Bank 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/16/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
04/02/2018Amended brief receivedAppellant
03/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/2018Submitted 
07/12/2018Objection disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/10/2018Objection filed 
06/28/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
05/17/2018Case ready to be set 
05/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/11/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/09/2018Response filed 
04/30/2018Motion filed 
04/19/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/16/2018Motion filed 
04/16/2018Amended brief filed 
04/05/2018Telephone call received 
04/03/2018Motion to file amended brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/03/2018Corrected brief requested 
04/02/2018Amended brief received 
04/02/2018Motion to file amended brief filed 
04/02/2018Response filed 
03/26/2018Letter issued by the court 
03/23/2018Motion to file amended brief filed 
03/19/2018Corrected brief requested 
03/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/2018Certificate of service filed 
02/01/2018Certificate of conference filed 
01/31/2018Response filed 
01/29/2018Fee requested 
01/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/12/2018No reporters record filed in civil case 
12/21/2017Fee paid 
12/15/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
12/13/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/07/2017Order entered 
10/26/2017Trial court signed order sustaining contest to affidavit 
10/18/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/17/2017Motion for extension received 
10/09/2017Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals 
10/09/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/05/2017Document filed 
10/04/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/27/2017Letter issued by the court 
09/18/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fidelity BankAppelleeHenry Rugeley
Thiessen, Henry AppellantHenry Thiessen
Trial Court Information
78th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable W. Bernard Fudge 
184,975-B 
Court Reporter, 78th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site