Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00321-CR    
02-17-00321-CR
10/10/2017
Sexual Assault
Theron Scott McDaniel 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/05/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
08/31/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/22/2018Submitted 
08/14/2018Set for submission on briefs 
08/14/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/14/2018Case reinstated 
08/07/2018Order issuedAbated
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/06/2018Case ready to be set 
06/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/10/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/04/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/13/2017Reporters record filed 
10/24/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/12/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/12/2017Order received from trial court 
10/10/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/05/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasEdward D. Lewallen
Don Schnebly
McDaniel, Theron ScottCriminal - AppellantHarmony Mary Schuerman
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Craig Towson 
CR16-0566 
Court Reporter, 43rd District Court, Parker County 
13 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site