Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00313-CV    
02-17-00313-CV
09/13/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Thomas Florence 
K. Rollings and A. Franco (Asst Warden) 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/26/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
01/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/30/2017Supplemental brief filedAppellant
11/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/2018Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/28/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
08/30/2018Motion disposedDismissed
08/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed and Dismissed
08/23/2018Motion filed 
08/21/2018Motion for judicial notice disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/03/2018Motion for judicial notice filed 
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/27/2018Affidavit filed 
04/04/2018Letter issued by the court 
03/26/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/26/2018Reply brief filed 
03/23/2018Motion filed 
03/21/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/21/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/07/2018Letter issued by the court 
03/05/2018Motion filed 
03/05/2018Motion filed 
01/25/2018Motion for judicial notice disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/22/2018Telephone call received 
01/18/2018Case ready to be set 
01/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/08/2018Certificate of service filed 
12/29/2017Certificate of service requested 
12/22/2017Motion for judicial notice filed 
12/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/12/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/12/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/12/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/12/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
12/01/2017Motion filed 
12/01/2017Motion filed 
12/01/2017Motion filed 
12/01/2017Letter received 
11/30/2017Supplemental brief filed 
11/30/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/20/2017Letter received 
11/15/2017Record Sent 
11/08/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/06/2017Letter received 
11/03/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/02/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/10/2017Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect 
09/21/2017Letter received 
09/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/12/2018StatusRelease to publisher
12/20/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Blalock, M. AppelleeAmber McKeon-Mueller
Florence, Thomas AppellantThomas Florence
Rollings, K. AppelleeAmber McKeon-Mueller
Jason Bramow
Franco, A.AppelleeAmber McKeon-Mueller
Trial Court Information
78th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable W. Bernard Fudge 
186,279-B 
Court Reporter, 78th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site