Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00305-CV    
02-17-00305-CV
09/06/2017
Juvenile
In the Matter of W.Z. 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/09/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/07/2018Case ready to be set 
02/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/08/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/09/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/06/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/20/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/06/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/18/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
David M. Curl
Z., W.AppellantFelipe O. Calzada
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-105051-17 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site