Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00302-CV    
02-17-00302-CV
09/01/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
David Hernandez 
Rockwater Energy Solutions, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/20/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/24/2018Document Received 
02/12/2018Case ready to be set 
02/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/09/2018Letter filed 
01/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/29/2017Letter issued by the court 
12/18/2017Notice of late brief 
10/27/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/24/2017Letter received 
10/19/2017Appearance of counsel 
10/19/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
10/19/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/19/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/19/2018StatusRelease to publisher
11/29/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hernandez, David AppellantDavid Hernandez
Rockwater Energy Solutions, Inc.AppelleeGavin Martinson
Michael R. Buchanan
Trial Court Information
48th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David L. Evans 
048-283327-16 
Court Reporter, 48th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site